IL HR0165 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares African Methodist Episcopal (AME) Day at the Capitol on March 27, 2019.
Title
AME DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-03-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=165&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0165.htm |