IL HR0160 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages Governor Rauner's Administration, including the Department of Human Services Divisions of Mental Health and Alcoholism and Substance Abuse, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and the Governor's Office to prioritize a plan aimed at securing and submitting an application for a planning grant for the State of Illinois. Urges the aforementioned groups to collaborate in this effort with key stakeholders, including organizations representing individuals with serious mental illnesses, community-based mental health providers, substance use treatment facilities, federally-qualified health centers, hospitals, supportive housing providers, and rural health clinics.
Title
CCBHC PRE-PLANNING GRANT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-05-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 021-000-000 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=160&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0160.htm |