IL HR0156 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates May of 2017 as "Fibromuscular Dysplasia Awareness Month" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIBROMUSCULAR DYSPLASIA MTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseResolution Adopted
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-16HouseRecommends Be Adopted Special Needs Services; 003-000-000
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback