IL HR0148 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - To Public Benefits Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Opposes any new taxes on sugar-sweetened beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OPPOSE SUGAR TAXES

Sponsors

Rep. David McSweeney [R]Rep. Brandon Phelps [D]Rep. Thomas Morrison [R]Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]
Rep. Jeanne Ives [R]Rep. Daniel Swanson [R]Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R]Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R]
Rep. Dave Severin [R]Rep. John Cabello [R]Rep. Mark Batinick [R]Rep. Natalie Manley [D]
Rep. Frances Hurley [D]Rep. Randy Frese [R]Rep. David Olsen [R]Rep. Jerry Long [R]
Rep. Steven Reick [R]Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R]Rep. Brad Halbrook [R]Rep. David Welter [R]
Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R]Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R]Rep. John Cavaletto [R]Rep. Avery Bourne [R]
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R]Rep. Margo McDermed [R]Rep. Robert Pritchard [R]Rep. Daniel Beiser [D]
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]Rep. Jerry Costello [D]Rep. Michael Halpin [D]Rep. Martin Moylan [D]
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]Rep. Sue Scherer [D]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]Rep. Sam Yingling [D]
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D]Rep. John D'Amico [D]Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R]Rep. Norine Hammond [R]Rep. Mary Flowers [D]Rep. Thomas Bennett [R]
Rep. Terri Bryant [R]Rep. Jay Hoffman [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]
Rep. Silvana Tabares [D]Rep. Rita Mayfield [D]Rep. Linda LaVia [D]Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D]
Rep. Daniel Burke [D]Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D]Rep. Robert Rita [D]Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R]
Rep. Robert Martwick [D]Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R]Rep. Grant Wehrli [R]Rep. Tony McCombie [R]
Rep. Cynthia Soto [D]Rep. Christine Winger [R]Rep. Chad Hays [R]Rep. Bill Mitchell [R]
Rep. David Reis [R]Rep. Patricia Bellock [R]Rep. Justin Slaughter [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15HouseTo Public Benefits Subcommittee
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback