IL HR0145 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 48-3)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

States opposition to legislative efforts to use State taxpayer funds to pay for abortions and to use taxpayer funds to pay for insurance costs for State employees to have abortions for any reason through all nine months of pregnancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABORTION - NO TAXPAYER FUNDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-03-15HouseTo Informed Consent Subcommitee
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-02-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sheri Jesiel

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback