IL HR0144 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports school-based health centers and declares February 2019 as "School-Based Healthcare Awareness Month" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL-BASED HEALTHCARE MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-20HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback