IL HR0135 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the U.S. Congress to defund Planned Parenthood.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PLANNED PARENTHOOD - DEFUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseTo Informed Consent Subcommitee
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback