IL HR0135 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to defund Planned Parenthood.
Title
PLANNED PARENTHOOD - DEFUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | To Informed Consent Subcommitee |
2017-03-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=135&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0135.htm |