IL HR0134 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates Illinois State Senator Frank Watson on his retirement from the Illinois Senate.
Title
RETIREMENT-SENATOR WATSON
Sponsors
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Robert Flider [D] | Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. David Reis [R] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Jim Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-03-03 | Resolution Adopted | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Stephens |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=134&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0134.htm |