IL HR0132 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Condemns the conduct of Illinois State Representative Chris Miller.
Title
REP. CHRIS MILLER-CONDEMNS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Motion in House (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 18 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-18 | House | Resolution Adopted 057-036-005 |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-03-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-03-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |