IL HR0131 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares October of 2017 as Disability Awareness Month in the State of Illinois in order to bring attention to conditions that so many Americans suffer from, and recognizes the work being done by disability advocates.
Title
DISABILITY AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Special Needs Services; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-07 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=131&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0131.htm |