IL HR0127 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares June 15, 2019 as Elder Abuse Awareness Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
ELDER ABUSE AWARENESS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=127&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0127.htm |