IL HR0126 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Illinois colleges, universities, tech companies, and government entities to work together to develop wireless technology designed to reduce traffic congestion.
Title
WIRELESS TECH FOR CONGESTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-14 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=126&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0126.htm |