IL HR0124 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-12)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates April 4, 2017 as Pay Equity Day in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAY EQUITY DAY

Sponsors

Rep. Barbara Currie [D]Rep. Patricia Bellock [R]Rep. Carol Ammons [D]Rep. Norine Hammond [R]
Rep. Carol Sente [D]Rep. Daniel Beiser [D]Rep. Avery Bourne [R]Rep. Terri Bryant [R]
Rep. Kelly Burke [D]Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D]Rep. Linda LaVia [D]Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]
Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. Marcus Evans [D]Rep. Sara Feigenholtz [D]
Rep. Laura Fine [D]Rep. Mary Flowers [D]Rep. Robyn Gabel [D]Rep. Jehan Gordon [D]
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D]Rep. Will Guzzardi [D]Rep. Sonya Harper [D]Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D]
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D]Rep. Frances Hurley [D]Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R]Rep. Sara Jimenez [R]
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]Rep. Louis Lang [D]Rep. Camille Lilly [D]Rep. Theresa Mah [D]
Rep. Natalie Manley [D]Rep. Robert Martwick [D]Rep. Rita Mayfield [D]Rep. Emily McAsey [D]
Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R]Rep. Tony McCombie [R]Rep. Margo McDermed [R]Rep. Christian Mitchell [D]
Rep. Anna Moeller [D]Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D]Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R]
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D]Rep. Robert Rita [D]Rep. Sue Scherer [D]Rep. Cynthia Soto [D]
Rep. Juliana Stratton [D]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]Rep. Silvana Tabares [D]Rep. Litesa Wallace [D]
Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R]Rep. Ann Williams [D]Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]Rep. Christine Winger [R]
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D]Rep. Martin Moylan [D]Rep. Michael Halpin [D]Rep. Jerry Costello [D]
Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. Al Riley [D]Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D]Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseResolution Adopted
2017-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-09HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback