IL HR0123 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Enbridge and any other pipeline company transporting fossil fuels to have an environmental impact study conducted by a third-party scientific organization with no ties to the industry before they lay any new section of pipe and before any section of existing pipe begins to transport tar sands oil or natural gas extracted by fracking, requires any environmental impact study to include the long-term impact of burning fossil fuels on the looming climate crisis, and requires Enbridge and any other pipeline company to be held fully responsible for any environmental damages caused by leaks or spills or for agricultural damage to the farms through which their pipelines pass.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENBRIDGE - ENVIRONMENTAL STUDY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback