IL HR0122 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges police departments around the State to create a community liaison police officer program similar to CAPS, that designates a specific number of patrol officers as community partners and liaisons, and we encourage police departments to establish advisory committees with members of the community and local officials to discuss ways to improve public safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY POLICING - URGES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseResolution Adopted
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-22HouseRecommends Be Adopted Police & First Responders Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Police & First Responders Committee
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback