IL HR0122 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes February 26, 2009 as Elgin Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
RECOGNIZES-ELGIN DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-04-22 | Resolution Adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-03-18 | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 015-000-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-25 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=122&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0122.htm |