IL HR0121 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to amend federal law, including the Controlled Substances Act, to explicitly allow states to set their own marijuana and hemp policies without federal interference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONGRESS - MARIJUANA POLICY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-05-16HouseResolution Adopted as Amended
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback