IL HR0116 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares opposition to raising the sales taxes on food and drugs.
Title
FOOD & DRUGS - NO SALES TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-03-09 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=116&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0116.htm |