IL HR0115 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Condemns President Donald J. Trump's executive order barring refugees from the United States and calls on him to uphold and protect the values of all of the people of this great nation, which was founded by immigrants on principles that include religious freedom and the notion that all people are welcome and created equal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

U.S. REFUGEE BAN - CONDEMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-08HouseRecommends Be Adopted Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 006-003-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback