IL HR0115 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates Taiwan on gaining inclusion in the U.S. Visa Waiver Program in 2012, welcomes the U.S.-Taiwan trade talks, and expresses support for Taiwan's efforts to secure entry into the Trans-Pacific Partnership.
Title
TAIWAN-U.S. PARTNERSHIPS
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Renee Kosel [R] | Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2013-04-10 | House | Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-03-28 | House | Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-02-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=115&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0115.htm |