IL HR0114 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 003-001-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Invites Mexican President Enrique Pena Nieto to address a joint session of the Illinois General Assembly to discuss President Trump's proposed border wall, the impact of a 20% tariff on goods imported from Mexico to pay for the wall, and the economic impact that such a wall and President Trump's policies will have on Illinois and Mexico.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INVITE - PRES. PENA NIETO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 003-001-000
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to International Trade & Commerce Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-04-26HouseRecommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 003-002-000
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback