IL HR0107 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the week of January 29 through February 4, 2017 as Catholic Schools Week in the State of Illinois.
Title
CATHOLIC SCHOOLS WEEK
Sponsors
Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=107&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0107.htm |