IL HR0101 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the State to redouble its efforts to work with the federal government, local governments, the private sector, civil society, schools, students, farmers, ranchers, fishing communities, and sportsmen to conserve the land, rivers, and lakes of Illinois for present and future generations to enjoy, taking into account a wide range of flexible and enduring conservation solutions that will improve access to nature for all people within Illinois, especially for communities that have historically lacked access to natural spaces. Further urges the State to pursue this goal in a way that protects private property rights and traditional land uses and enables landowners to pass down the working land of those landowners to the next generation.
Title
URGES REDOUBLING CONSERVATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=101&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0101.htm |