IL HR0097 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March of 2019 as MSA Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
MSA AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-03-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=97&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0097.htm |