IL HR0096 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorates the 100th anniversary of the ratification by the State of Illinois of the Nineteenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States on June 10, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

19TH AMENDMENT-COMMEND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-02-13HouseResolution Adopted
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar Agreed Resolutions
2019-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback