IL HR0095 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates Nancy Voots on her retirement as Will County Clerk and thanks her for making a positive difference in the lives of Will County residents.
Title
CONGRATS-NANCY VOOTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-07 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=95&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0095.htm |