IL HR0095 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress and President Donald J. Trump to provide federal funding for Lewis University Airport to construct an air traffic control tower, or be added to a federal pilot program allowing an air traffic control program.
Title
LEWIS UNIV. AIRPORT TOWER
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. David Welter [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=95&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0095.htm |