IL HR0089 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the City of Chicago to begin repurposing the closed public schools within its system into new-purpose facilities as soon as possible.
Title
CPS - REPURPOSE SCHOOLS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=89&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0089.htm |