IL HR0087 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-13)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges support for funding the physical infrastructure of early childhood education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILDHOOD PROGRAMS-FUNDING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Capital Committee
2019-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback