IL HR0081 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States that physical education is an essential and integral part of educating the whole child and that ALL students in the State of Illinois should have access to equitable, high quality, standards-based physical education programming being supported by equitable resources and funding. Urges all physical education programs to be in compliance with and accountable for following the Illinois School Code.
Title
PHYSICAL EDUCATION-ESSENTIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Resolution Adopted 099-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-16 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Fourth Day |
2021-04-15 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Third Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Second Day |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |