IL HR0076 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the U.S. Congress to introduce and pass legislation that eliminates both the Government Pension Offset and the Windfall Elimination Provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PASS SOC SEC LEGISLATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-011-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback