IL HR0074 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the federal government to take action on the issue of rural dental care to save these communities from deteriorating any further.
Title
RURAL DENTAL CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=74&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0074.htm |