IL HR0059 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-9)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-9)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commends Assistant Doorkeeper Wayne Padget of the Illinois House of Representatives for his quick thinking and decisive action on the House floor on January 10, 2021 and for his unflinching dedication to the Illinois House of Representatives.
Title
COMMEND-WAYNE PADGET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-02-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2021-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=59&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0059.htm |