IL HR0058 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Illinois Department of Public Health to adopt new guidelines for painkillers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DPH-PAINKILLER GUIDELINES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseResolution Adopted
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-20HouseRecommends Be Adopted Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 012-000-000
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-01-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-01-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback