IL HR0048 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares February 4 through February 11, 2023 as Court Reporting and Captioning Week in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COURT REPORTING/CAPTIONING WK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseTabled By Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2023-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Amy L. Grant

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback