IL HR0046 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Department of Agriculture to study the effects and the types of land loss to Black farmers. Calls for state support and capacity building for Black farming communities across the state and a dedication to helping grow agriculture in rural, urban, and suburban areas. States that Black farmers can play a leading role in our local healthy food system and create regional networks of jobs, food, and opportunities.
Title
BLACK FARMERS-ILLINOIS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Resolution Adopted 099-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Fourth Day |
2021-04-15 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Third Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Second Day |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |