IL HR0043 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Calls upon the leaders of the State of Illinois to recognize and continue to defend the importance of bacon and other pork products, along with the pork producers, to the economy, job growth, and the consumer preference of the people of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEFEND PORK & BACON

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseResolution Adopted
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback