IL HR0032 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States the belief that the Illinois Income Tax Act should not be amended to permit taxing retirement income.
Title
NO TAXES ON RETIREMENT INCOME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=32&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0032.htm |