IL HR0029 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

States the belief that the Illinois Income Tax Act should not be amended to permit taxing retirement income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO TAXES ON RETIREMENT INCOME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-24HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback