IL HR0028 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares February 5 through February 11, 2023 as Burn Awareness Week. Urges all government agencies, fire, life safety, and health care organizations, communications media, and the people of Illinois to observe this week with the appropriate ceremonies and activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BURN AWARENESS WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2023-06-26HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-05-17HouseTo Fire Subcommittee
2023-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to Police & Fire Committee
2023-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback