IL HR0028 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

States the body's opposition to any additional taxes on advertising or advertising-related services and states the belief that Illinois' present fiscal crisis must be managed in other ways besides a new tax on business owners throughout the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OPPOSE NEW ADVERTISING TAXES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-24HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback