IL HR0025 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares our intent to eradicate financial abuse of the elderly in Illinois. Designates June 15, 2017 as Illinois Elder Abuse Awareness Day in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL ELDER ABUSE AWARENESS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-07HouseResolution Adopted
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-09HouseRecommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 013-000-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Aging Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback