IL HR0016 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to pass legislation in support of the establishment of VA emergency prescription refill programs nationwide to ensure that, in emergency situations, veterans may receive medication directly from their local pharmacy and VA facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

URGE CONGRESS-VETS-MEDS REFILL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-06-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-06-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted
2017-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-04HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback