IL HR0011 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulates Iron Workers Local 380 of the International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers Union on its 100th anniversary. Thanks the union and its members for their invaluable work to make Illinois a leading state for world-class infrastructure and recognizes that the members are the working people who conduct the manual labor stemming from 30% of planned Rebuild Illinois state program distribution spending.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONGRATS-IRONWORKERS LOCAL 380

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
2023-02-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
2023-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
2023-01-31HouseResolution Adopted
2023-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar Agreed Resolutions
2023-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback