IL HR0011 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes September 2019 as Dystonia Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DYSTONIA AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-02-27HouseResolution Adopted
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-02-20HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-12-12HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback