IL HR0011 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes September 2019 as Dystonia Awareness Month.
Title
DYSTONIA AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-02-27 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-12-12 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=11&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0011.htm |