IL HR0007 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes National Domestic Violence Awareness Month in October 2021 and supports and commends the efforts of those people and organizations who work tirelessly to help victims break free of the devastating effects of domestic abuse.
Title
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AWARE MTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-04-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-14 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=7&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0007.htm |