IL HR0006 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Inspector General of the City of Chicago to conduct a performance audit of the Chicago Police Department to determine and assess police emergency response times in Chicago neighborhoods and communities and to make recommendations to improve response times in primarily African American and Hispanic neighborhoods and communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHICAGO POLICE-RESPONSE TIME

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted 079-005-000
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-28HouseRecommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-04HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback