IL HR0005 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to expand the Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program so that it includes farming as an applicable career for loan forgiveness.
Title
LOAN FORGIVENESS-FARMING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Resolution Adopted 099-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-16 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Fourth Day |
2021-04-15 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Third Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Second Day |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |